Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/30/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 01/30/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 01/30/2001
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 01/30/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/07/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/01/2001
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/30/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 08/02/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/08/2002