Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 04/17/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 07/09/2002
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 07/16/2002
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/24/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 07/24/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/12/2002
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/19/2002