Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 04/17/2002
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 04/17/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 04/17/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/17/2002
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 04/17/2002
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 04/17/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 04/17/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 04/17/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/22/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/23/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/24/2002
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/29/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 05/07/2002
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/14/2002
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 08/01/2002