Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/18/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/18/2002
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 04/18/2002
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 04/18/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/22/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/22/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/22/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/22/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 04/22/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 04/23/2002
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/23/2002
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/23/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/29/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 04/30/2002
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 04/30/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 04/30/2002
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/01/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/02/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 05/02/2002
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/06/2002
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/08/2002
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 05/17/2002
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/22/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 05/23/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/04/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/04/2002
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 06/06/2002
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/11/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/13/2002
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/14/2002
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/19/2002
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/19/2002
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/19/2002
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/24/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/25/2002
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 06/26/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/19/2002