Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 04/18/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/22/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 04/23/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 04/23/2002
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/24/2002
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/25/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 04/29/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/30/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/30/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/30/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 05/01/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/01/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/01/2002
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/01/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 05/07/2002
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/07/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 05/21/2002
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/23/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/03/2002
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/04/2002
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/04/2002
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/11/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/11/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/13/2002
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/17/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/19/2002
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/19/2002
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/20/2002
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 06/20/2002
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/24/2002
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/08/2002
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 07/09/2002
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/22/2002
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 07/24/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/05/2002
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/09/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/18/2002
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 09/19/2002
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/19/2002
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/23/2002
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 09/23/2002
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/26/2002
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/02/2002
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/07/2002
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 11/15/2002