Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 04/25/2002
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/07/2002
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/07/2002
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/14/2002
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 05/16/2002
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/16/2002
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 05/16/2002
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/16/2002
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/16/2002
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/16/2002
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/16/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 05/16/2002
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/04/2002
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/04/2002
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 06/04/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/04/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 06/18/2002
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/18/2002
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/26/2002
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/26/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/10/2002
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 07/10/2002
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/18/2002
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 07/18/2002
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/19/2002
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/19/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 07/26/2002
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/29/2002
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 07/29/2002
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/30/2002
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 08/01/2002
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 08/01/2002
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 08/01/2002
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 08/01/2002
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 08/01/2002
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 08/01/2002
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 08/01/2002
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 08/01/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/10/2002
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/10/2002
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 09/17/2002
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/24/2002
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 10/04/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/17/2002
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 11/12/2002
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 11/12/2002