Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 04/30/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 04/30/2002
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 04/30/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 04/30/2002
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 04/30/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 04/30/2002
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/08/2002
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/21/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/21/2002
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/05/2002
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/26/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 08/01/2002