Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/02/2002
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 05/07/2002
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/10/2002
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/13/2002
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/14/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/15/2002