There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Law Enforcement Officers Safety Act of 2002

Short Titles as Introduced

Law Enforcement Officers Safety Act of 2002

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 18, United States Code, to exempt qualified current and former law enforcement officers from state laws prohibiting the carrying of concealed handguns.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/19/2002By Senator Leahy from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 107-345. Minority views filed.
11/14/2002Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with amendments. Without written report.
05/08/2002Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
11/19/2002By Senator Leahy from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 107-345. Minority views filed.
Action By: Senate
11/14/2002Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with amendments. Without written report.
11/14/2002Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 761.
Action By: Senate
11/14/2002Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
09/19/2002Committee on the Judiciary. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
07/23/2002Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 107-935.
05/08/2002Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/08/2002
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/08/2002
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 05/08/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 05/08/2002
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 05/08/2002
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 05/08/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/14/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/15/2002
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 05/20/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 06/03/2002
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/04/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/05/2002
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/05/2002
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 06/05/2002
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/13/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 06/20/2002
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/24/2002
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/27/2002
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/27/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/28/2002
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/09/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 07/09/2002
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 07/10/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/10/2002
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/11/2002
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/15/2002
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/15/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/18/2002
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/22/2002
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/23/2002
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/23/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 07/30/2002
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/30/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/03/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/11/2002
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 09/12/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/19/2002
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 09/26/2002
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 10/01/2002
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 10/04/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/15/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary05/08/2002 Referred to
07/23/2002 Hearings by
11/14/2002 Markup by
11/14/2002 Reported by S. Rept. 107-345

No related bill information was received for S.2480.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2480. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (11/14/2002)

Law Enforcement Officers Safety Act of 2002 - Amends the Federal criminal code to authorize qualified law enforcement officers (including certain qualified retired officers) carrying the photographic identification issued by their governmental agency, notwithstanding State or local laws, to carry a concealed firearm. Provides that such authorization shall not supersede State laws that: (1) permit private entities to prohibit the possession of concealed firearms on their property; or (2) prohibit the possession of firearms on State or local government property. Excludes from the definition of "firearm" any machine gun, firearm silencer, or destructive device.