Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/08/2002
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/08/2002
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 05/08/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 05/08/2002
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 05/08/2002
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 05/08/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/14/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/15/2002
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 05/20/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 06/03/2002
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/04/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/05/2002
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/05/2002
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 06/05/2002
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/13/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 06/20/2002
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/24/2002
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/27/2002
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/27/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/28/2002
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/09/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 07/09/2002
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 07/10/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/10/2002
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/11/2002
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/15/2002
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/15/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/18/2002
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/22/2002
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/23/2002
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/23/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 07/30/2002
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/30/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/03/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/11/2002
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 09/12/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/19/2002
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 09/26/2002
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 10/01/2002
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 10/04/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/15/2002