Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/08/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/08/2002
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 05/08/2002
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/08/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/08/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO]* 05/08/2002
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/08/2002
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/08/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 05/08/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 05/14/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/16/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/23/2002
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/09/2002