Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/15/2002
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/15/2002
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/20/2002
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/19/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/19/2002
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/20/2002