Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/16/2002
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 05/16/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/16/2002
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 05/16/2002
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 05/16/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 05/16/2002
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 05/16/2002
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 05/16/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/16/2002
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 05/16/2002
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/16/2002
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 05/16/2002
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/05/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 06/27/2002
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/12/2002
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/15/2002
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 07/22/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/22/2002
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/26/2002
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 09/05/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/02/2002