Text: S.2538 — 107th Congress (2001-2002)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (05/23/2002)

 
[Congressional Bills 107th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[S. 2538 Placed on Calendar Senate (PCS)]






                                                       Calendar No. 385
107th CONGRESS
  2d Session
                                S. 2538

    To amend the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to provide for an 
                 increase in the Federal minimum wage.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                              May 22, 2002

    Mr. Kennedy (for himself, Mr. Akaka, Mr. Baucus, Mr. Bayh, Mr. 
   Bingaman, Mrs. Boxer, Mr. Byrd, Ms. Cantwell, Mrs. Carnahan, Mr. 
 Carper, Mrs. Clinton, Mr. Corzine, Mr. Daschle, Mr. Dayton, Mr. Dodd, 
Mr. Durbin, Mr. Edwards, Mr. Feingold, Mrs. Feinstein, Mr. Harkin, Mr. 
Inouye, Mr. Jeffords, Mr. Kerry, Mr. Kohl, Ms. Landrieu, Mr. Lieberman, 
 Mr. Leahy, Mr. Levin, Ms. Mikulski, Mrs. Murray, Mr. Reed, Mr. Reid, 
     Mr. Rockefeller, Mr. Sarbanes, Mr. Schumer, Ms. Stabenow, Mr. 
  Torricelli, Mr. Wellstone, and Mr. Wyden) introduced the following 
                  bill; which was read the first time

                              May 23, 2002

            Read the second time and placed on the calendar

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL


 
    To amend the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to provide for an 
                 increase in the Federal minimum wage.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Fair Minimum Wage Act of 2002''.

SEC. 2. MINIMUM WAGE.

    (a) In General.--Section 6(a)(1) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 
1938 (29 U.S.C. 206(a)(1)) is amended to read as follows:
            ``(1) except as otherwise provided in this section, not 
        less than--
                    ``(A) $5.75 an hour beginning 60 days after the 
                date of enactment of the Fair Minimum Wage Act of 2002;
                    ``(B) $6.25 an hour during the year beginning 
                January 1, 2003; and
                    ``(C) $6.65 an hour beginning January 1, 2004;''.
    (b) Effective Date.--The amendment made by subsection (a) shall 
take effect 60 days after the date of enactment of this Act.

SEC. 3. APPLICABILITY OF MINIMUM WAGE TO THE COMMONWEALTH OF THE 
              NORTHERN MARIANA ISLANDS.

    (a) In General.--Section 6 of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 
(29 U.S.C. 206) shall apply to the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana 
Islands.
    (b) Transition.--Notwithstanding subsection (a), the minimum wage 
applicable to the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands under 
section 6(a)(1) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 (29 U.S.C. 
206(a)(1)) shall be--
            (1) $3.55 an hour beginning 60 days after the date of 
        enactment of this Act; and
            (2) increased by $0.50 an hour (or such lesser amount as 
        may be necessary to equal the minimum wage under section 
        6(a)(1) of such Act), beginning 6 months after the date of 
        enactment of this Act and every 6 months thereafter until the 
        minimum wage applicable to the Commonwealth of the Northern 
        Mariana Islands under this subsection is equal to the minimum 
        wage set forth in such section.




                                                       Calendar No. 385

107th CONGRESS

  2d Session

                                S. 2538

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL

    To amend the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to provide for an 
                 increase in the Federal minimum wage.

_______________________________________________________________________

                              May 23, 2002

            Read the second time and placed on the calendar