There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Support of American Eagle Silver Bullion Program Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the Secretary of the Treasury to purchase silver on the open market when the silver stockpile is depleted, to be used to mint coins.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
07/23/2002Became Public Law No: 107-201. (TXT | PDF)
07/23/2002Signed by President.
07/11/2002Presented to President.
06/28/2002Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H4320-4321)
06/28/2002Committee on Financial Services discharged.
06/21/2002Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text as passed Senate: CR S5915)
06/21/2002Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5915)
06/06/2002Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
07/23/2002Became Public Law No: 107-201. (TXT | PDF)
07/23/2002Signed by President.
07/11/2002SenatePresented to President.
06/28/2002-2:32amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/28/2002-2:32amHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H4320-4321)
06/28/2002-2:32amHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4320-4321)
06/28/2002-2:31amHouseMr. Tiberi asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
06/28/2002HouseCommittee on Financial Services discharged.
06/24/2002HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
06/24/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/24/2002-12:30pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/21/2002SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text as passed Senate: CR S5915)
06/21/2002SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5915)
06/06/2002SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
06/06/2002SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5208)

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 06/06/2002
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 06/06/2002
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 06/06/2002
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 06/06/2002
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 06/06/2002

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs06/06/2002 Referred to
06/21/2002 Discharged from
House Financial Services06/24/2002 Referred to
06/28/2002 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2594. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/06/2002)

Support of American Eagle Silver Bullion Program Act - Requires the Secretary of the Treasury to obtain silver from other available sources when the United States silver stockpile is depleted. Prohibits the Secretary from paying more than the average world price for silver under any circumstances.