Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 06/12/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 06/21/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 06/27/2002
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/08/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 07/08/2002
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/08/2002
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/15/2002
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 07/15/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/16/2002
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/22/2002
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/31/2002
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/03/2002
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/11/2002
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 10/01/2002
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/02/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/16/2002