Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 06/14/2002
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 06/14/2002
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 06/14/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/14/2002
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 06/14/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 06/14/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/14/2002
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 06/14/2002
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 06/14/2002
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 06/17/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/17/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/15/2002
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 07/17/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/26/2002
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/30/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 08/01/2002
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/09/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/09/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/26/2002
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/17/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 11/15/2002