Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/20/2002
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 06/20/2002
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/09/2002
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/10/2002
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/15/2002
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/23/2002
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/30/2002
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/17/2002
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/17/2002
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/20/2002
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/10/2002