Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 06/21/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 06/21/2002
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 06/21/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/21/2002
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/26/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/12/2002
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/19/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/05/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/24/2002
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/04/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/04/2002
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 10/08/2002
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/16/2002