Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/06/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/06/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/06/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 02/06/2001
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 02/06/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 02/06/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/06/2001
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 02/06/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 02/28/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/25/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/31/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/04/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 12/03/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 12/11/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 12/12/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 12/12/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/19/2001
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 04/11/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/20/2002
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/17/2002
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/18/2002