Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 06/25/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/10/2002
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/17/2002
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/17/2002
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/18/2002
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/18/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/18/2002
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/23/2002
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/25/2002
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/26/2002
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/10/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/10/2002
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 09/18/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 09/18/2002
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 10/02/2002