Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 01/23/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 01/23/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/24/2001
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 01/24/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 01/24/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 01/25/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 01/30/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 01/30/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 01/30/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/08/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/08/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/08/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/08/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 02/27/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 02/27/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 03/08/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/14/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/14/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/15/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/30/2001