Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 07/16/2002
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/16/2002
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 07/18/2002
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/22/2002
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/29/2002
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/31/2002
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/31/2002
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/31/2002
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 08/01/2002
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 08/01/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/03/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/15/2002