Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 07/16/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 07/16/2002
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 07/16/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 07/16/2002
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 07/16/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 07/16/2002
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 07/17/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 07/18/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 07/18/2002
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/18/2002
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/22/2002
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/23/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/23/2002
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 07/23/2002
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/23/2002
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/23/2002
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 07/24/2002
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/24/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 07/30/2002
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/30/2002
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/31/2002
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/31/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/03/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/13/2002
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/19/2002