Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 07/17/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 07/17/2002
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 07/17/2002
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 07/17/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 07/17/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/22/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/31/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/05/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/05/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/12/2002