Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 07/22/2002
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 07/22/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/22/2002
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 07/22/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 07/22/2002
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 07/22/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 07/22/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 07/22/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 07/22/2002
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/30/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 08/01/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/05/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/05/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/05/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/05/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/09/2002
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/17/2002
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/26/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/30/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/30/2002
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 10/04/2002