Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/27/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/01/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/26/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 04/05/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/05/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/05/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 06/18/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/28/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 11/13/2001