Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 07/25/2002
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 07/25/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 07/25/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/26/2002
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/26/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 07/26/2002
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/26/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/26/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 07/26/2002
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/30/2002
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/30/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/30/2002
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/31/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 07/31/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/31/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 08/01/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 08/01/2002