Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/26/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 02/26/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 02/26/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 02/28/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 02/28/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/28/2001
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 02/28/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/28/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 02/28/2001
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/05/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/05/2001
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/05/2001
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/05/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/05/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/05/2001
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/05/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/13/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/13/2001
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 03/13/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/13/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/13/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/15/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/15/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/15/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/15/2001
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/15/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/20/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 03/20/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/20/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/20/2001
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/20/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/05/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 04/05/2001
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/05/2001
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/24/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 05/01/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/07/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/07/2001
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/09/2001
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 05/15/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/21/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/21/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/23/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/23/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 05/24/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/24/2001
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/05/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/05/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/12/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/18/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/18/2001
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/09/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/24/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/26/2001
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 10/17/2001
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 11/29/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 01/23/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 02/07/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/21/2002
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/24/2002