Summary: S.2810 — 107th Congress (2001-2002)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (07/26/2002)

Amends the Communications Satellite Act of 1962 to require the initial public offering for INTELSAT to begin on or about December 31, 2003 (currently, October 1, 2001), with an authorized extension until June 30, 2004 (currently, December 31, 2002).