Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 07/29/2002
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 07/29/2002
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 07/29/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 07/29/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 07/29/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO]* 07/29/2002
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 07/29/2002
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 07/29/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 07/29/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 07/29/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 07/29/2002
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 07/29/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 07/29/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 07/31/2002
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 09/03/2002
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/12/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/12/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 09/13/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/13/2002
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/26/2002
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 10/02/2002
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 10/02/2002