Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 07/30/2002
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 07/30/2002
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 07/30/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 08/01/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 08/01/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 08/01/2002
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/03/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/09/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/03/2002
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 11/12/2002
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 11/12/2002