Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 02/08/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/08/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/08/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 02/08/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/15/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/13/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/19/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/19/2001
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 03/19/2001
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/19/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/19/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 04/05/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/03/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/09/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/22/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/22/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/22/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/05/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 06/05/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/05/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 06/05/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/08/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/11/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/12/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/12/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/18/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/18/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/20/2001