Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 08/01/2002
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 09/05/2002
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/05/2002
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/05/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/09/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/10/2002
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/10/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/10/2002
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 09/12/2002
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/12/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/13/2002
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/13/2002
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/13/2002
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/13/2002
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/13/2002
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/17/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/17/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/17/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/17/2002
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/17/2002
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/19/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 09/19/2002
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/23/2002
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/23/2002
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/24/2002
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/26/2002
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 09/26/2002
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 09/30/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 09/30/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/30/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/30/2002
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 10/02/2002
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/02/2002
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 10/03/2002
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/03/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 10/03/2002
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/08/2002
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/08/2002
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/08/2002
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/15/2002
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 10/15/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/16/2002
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/16/2002
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/16/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 10/16/2002
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/16/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 10/17/2002
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/17/2002
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/17/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 10/17/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/17/2002
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/17/2002
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/17/2002
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 10/17/2002
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/17/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 10/17/2002
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 11/13/2002
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 11/13/2002