Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 09/03/2002
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 09/04/2002
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/04/2002
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 09/04/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/04/2002
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/04/2002
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/04/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/05/2002
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 09/10/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 09/10/2002
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/10/2002
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/10/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/10/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 09/24/2002
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/17/2002