Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/17/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/19/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 09/26/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/30/2002
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/01/2002
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/07/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/09/2002
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/09/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 10/10/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/12/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 11/12/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/13/2002
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/14/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 11/14/2002