Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 09/12/2002
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 09/12/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 09/12/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO]* 09/12/2002
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 09/12/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 09/12/2002
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 09/12/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 09/12/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 09/12/2002
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/23/2002
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/23/2002
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/30/2002
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/03/2002
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 10/03/2002
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/19/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 11/19/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/19/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew