Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 09/19/2002
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 09/19/2002
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/24/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/03/2002
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 10/08/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 10/09/2002
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/10/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 10/16/2002