Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 09/26/2002
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/01/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/01/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 10/03/2002
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/07/2002
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 10/09/2002
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 10/09/2002
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/16/2002