Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 10/01/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/02/2002
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 10/02/2002
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/02/2002
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 10/02/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/04/2002
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/04/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/04/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 10/04/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 10/07/2002
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/09/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/09/2002
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/10/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/16/2002
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/16/2002
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/17/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 10/17/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/17/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/12/2002
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 11/13/2002
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 11/18/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 11/18/2002
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/20/2002