Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 10/16/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 10/16/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/12/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/15/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 11/18/2002
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/18/2002
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 11/18/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/19/2002