There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Paul and Sheila Wellstone Center for Community Building Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Paul and Sheila Wellstone Center for Community Building Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Paul and Sheila Wellstone Center for Community Building Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide a grant for the construction of a new community center in St. Paul, Minnesota, in honor of the late Senator Paul Wellstone and his beloved wife, Sheila.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
12/02/2002Became Public Law No: 107-316. (TXT | PDF)
12/02/2002Signed by President.
11/22/2002Presented to President.
11/15/2002Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR 11/14/2002 H8939)
11/14/2002Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11100-11101; text as passed Senate: CR S11101)
11/14/2002Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/02/2002Became Public Law No: 107-316. (TXT | PDF)
12/02/2002Signed by President.
11/22/2002SenatePresented to President.
11/15/2002-2:18amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/15/2002-2:18amHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR 11/14/2002 H8939)
11/15/2002-2:18amHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR 11/14/2002 H8925-9007)
11/15/2002-2:17amHouseMr. Armey asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
11/14/2002-6:07pmHouseHeld at the desk.
11/14/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/14/2002-3:15pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/14/2002SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11100-11101; text as passed Senate: CR S11101)

Cosponsors (99)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 11/14/2002
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 11/14/2002
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 11/14/2002
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 11/14/2002
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 11/14/2002

Committees (0)

As of 10/23/2020 text has not been received for S.3156 - Paul and Sheila Wellstone Center for Community Building Act

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


No related bill information was received for S.3156.


Subjects (18)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.3156. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (11/14/2002)

Paul and Sheila Wellstone Center for Community Building Act - Directs the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development to award a $10 million grant to Neighborhood House of St. Paul, Minnesota, to finance the construction of a new community center in St. Paul, to be known as the Paul and Sheila Wellstone Center for Community Building. Authorizes appropriations.