Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 02/13/2001
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 02/13/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 02/13/2001
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 02/13/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 02/13/2001
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 02/13/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 02/13/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 02/13/2001
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 02/13/2001
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 02/27/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/21/2001
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/04/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/25/2001