Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 02/13/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 02/13/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/05/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/06/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/08/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/19/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/28/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/26/2001