Refine your search

5 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
11/15/2001 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate concurred in House amendment with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text as Senate agreed to House amendment with amendment: CR S11926)
03/14/2001 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H898-901)
03/12/2001 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 107-18.
02/14/2001 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 98 - 0. Record Vote Number: 12.(text: CR S1381-1384)
02/13/2001 Introduced in Senate