Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/14/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/14/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/14/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/14/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 02/14/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/14/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/14/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 02/14/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 02/14/2001
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/14/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/14/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 02/14/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/14/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/28/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/12/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/28/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/01/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/02/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/14/2001