There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Peopling of America Theme Study Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Peopling of America Theme Study Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a theme study on the peopling of America, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
08/03/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8995-8996; text: CR S8995-8996)
06/05/2001Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 107-24.
02/14/2001Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/06/2001HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
09/06/2001HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Resources
09/05/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
09/05/2001-2:06pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/05/2001SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/03/2001SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8995-8996; text: CR S8995-8996)
06/05/2001SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 59.
06/05/2001SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 107-24.
05/16/2001SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/14/2001SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1403)
02/14/2001SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1402-1403)

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/14/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 02/14/2001

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/14/2001 Referred to
05/16/2001 Markup by
06/05/2001 Reported by S. Rept. 107-24
House Resources09/05/2001 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands09/06/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.329.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.329. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (06/05/2001)

Peopling of America Theme Study Act - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to prepare and submit to Congress a national historic landmark theme study on the peopling of America to identify regions, areas, trails, districts, communities, sites, buildings, structures, objects, organizations, societies, and cultures that: (1) best illustrate and commemorate key events or decisions affecting the peopling of America; and (2) can provide a basis for the preservation and interpretation of the peopling of America that has shaped U.S. culture and society.

Authorizes the Secretary to enter into cooperative agreements with educational institutions, professional associations, or other knowledgeable entities to prepare the study and promote cooperative arrangements and programs relating to the peopling of America.

Authorizes appropriations.