Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/14/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/08/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/27/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/27/2001
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 03/27/2001
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 03/28/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/29/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/01/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 05/01/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 04/15/2002