Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/15/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 02/27/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/27/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/27/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 02/28/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/07/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/14/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/15/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 03/28/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/28/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/30/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/24/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/24/2001
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/09/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/15/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 05/22/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/22/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/07/2001
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 06/19/2001
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/19/2001
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/19/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/25/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/10/2001
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/24/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/31/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/04/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/25/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/04/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 12/20/2001