Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/28/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/28/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 02/28/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/28/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/28/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/28/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/28/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 02/28/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 02/28/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 02/28/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/28/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/28/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 02/28/2001
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 02/28/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/28/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 02/28/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/28/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/28/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/28/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/28/2001
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/06/2001
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 03/06/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/06/2001
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/06/2001
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 03/06/2001
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 03/06/2001
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/06/2001
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/06/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/06/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/06/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/06/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/06/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/08/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 03/08/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 03/12/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/12/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/12/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/12/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/12/2001
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/12/2001
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/12/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/15/2001
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/15/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/15/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/15/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/20/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/20/2001
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 04/05/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/05/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 04/05/2001
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/24/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/24/2001
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 04/25/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 04/25/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/25/2001